Global Patent Index - EP 0722037 B1

EP 0722037 B1 2000-10-18 - Method for injecting fluid into a wellbore

Title (en)

Method for injecting fluid into a wellbore

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Injektion von Fluiden in ein Bohrloch

Title (fr)

Methode pour l'injection d'un fluide dans un trou de forage

Publication

EP 0722037 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96300274 A

Priority

  • US 37254695 A
  • US 55519395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0722037A2] An apparatus for injecting fluid into a wellbore. The apparatus comprises a housing (12) and a valve sleeve (50). The housing (12) has a chamber (36) and a port (30) in communication with the chamber (36). The chamber (36) is adapted to hold a first fluid, such as a cement accelerant, therein. The valve sleeve (50) serves to open the port (30) so that the fluid first fluid is free to flow out of the chamber (36) through the port (30) in response to the flow of a second fluid, such as cement. A portion of the valve sleeve (50) extends below the housing (12) so that when the valve sleeve (50) engages a surface therebelow, the valve sleeve (50) is forced upwardly to open the port (30). The housing (12) and/or the valve sleeve (50) may be made of a on-metallic material in order to facilitate drilling of the apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 33/16; E21B 27/02; E21B 34/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 27/02 (2006.01); E21B 33/16 (2006.01); E21B 47/09 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/16 (2013.01); E21B 27/02 (2013.01); E21B 47/09 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0722037 A2 19960717; EP 0722037 A3 19970102; EP 0722037 B1 20001018; DE 69610647 D1 20001123; DE 69610647 T2 20010215

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-10-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060112

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-01-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050110

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610647 20001123

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-10-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-04-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, INC.

2000-02-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981127

1999-12-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR INJECTING FLUID INTO A WELLBORE

1999-11-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR INJECTING FLUID INTO A WELLBORE

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981127

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970205

1997-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1996-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL