Global Patent Index - EP 0722339 A4

EP 0722339 A4 2001-05-23 - $i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) 01 (CVD111) AND NON-01 (CVD112 AND CVD112RM) SEROGROUP VACCINE STRAINS AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME

Title (en)

$i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) 01 (CVD111) AND NON-01 (CVD112 AND CVD112RM) SEROGROUP VACCINE STRAINS AND METHODS OF MAKING SAME

Title (de)

IMPFSTÄMME DER SEROGRUPPE 01 (CVD111) UND NICHT-01 (CVD112 UND CVD112RM) VON -i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) UND METHODEN IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SOUCHES DE VACCINS DES SEROGROUPES 01 (CVD111) ET NON-01 (CVD112 ET CVD112RM) DU $i(VIBRIO CHOLERAE) ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION DESDITES SOUCHES

Publication

EP 0722339 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 94930665 A

Priority

  • US 9411424 W
  • US 13343893 A
  • US 13343993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9510300A1] Avirulent Vibrio cholerae strains of 01 (CVD111) and non-01 (CVD112 and CVD112RM) serogroups having the DNA of the cholera toxin core and the RS1 sequences of the cholera toxin locus deleted, and further having a DNA encoding a resistance to mercury, and a DNA encoding the cholera toxin B subunit, or a part thereof sufficient to confer immunogenicity, re-inserted in the chromosome. Methods of making the avirulent V. cholerae 01 and non-01 strains of the invention, and cholera vaccines using these strains.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/106; C12N 1/21; C12N 15/63; C12N 15/65; C12N 15/74; C12R 1/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/106 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); C07K 14/28 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 15/63 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12R 1/63 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/107 (2013.01); C07K 14/28 (2013.01); A61K 2039/522 (2013.01); Y02A 50/472 (2018.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PX] WO 9401533 A1 19940120 - HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al
  • [X] WO 9118979 A1 19911212 - UNIV MARYLAND [US]
  • [A] US 5135862 A 19920804 - KAPER JAMES B [US], et al
  • [A] LEVINE M M ET AL: "RECOMBINANT LIVE CHOLERA VACCINES", VIBRIO CHOLERAE AND CHOLERA: MOLECULAR TO GLOBAL PERSPECTIVES,US,AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY,, PAGE(S) 395-413, XP000886576
  • [A] CHOLERA WORKING GROUP: "Large epidemic of cholera-like disease in Bangladesh caused by vibrio 0139 synonym Bengal", THE LANCET, vol. 342, 14 August 1993 (1993-08-14), pages 387 - 390, XP000973630
  • [A] PEARSON ET AL: "CTX genetic element encodes a site-specific recomnation system and an intestinal colonization factor", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,US,NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, vol. 90, 1 April 1993 (1993-04-01), pages 3750 - 3754, XP002085116, ISSN: 0027-8424
  • [T] TACKET ET AL: "Initial Clinical Studies of CVD 112 Vibrio Cholerae O139 Live Oral Vaccine: Safety and Efficacy against Experimental Challenge", THE JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, vol. 172, 1995, pages 883 - 886, XP000973598
  • See also references of WO 9510300A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

DOCDB simple family

WO 9510300 A1 19950420; AU 699912 B2 19981217; AU 7971494 A 19950504; CA 2173606 A1 19950420; CN 1104907 C 20030409; CN 1142774 A 19970212; EP 0722339 A1 19960724; EP 0722339 A4 20010523; JP 3379582 B2 20030224; JP H09504430 A 19970506; KR 100348156 B1 20030106; RU 2140981 C1 19991110