Global Patent Index - EP 0722539 B1

EP 0722539 B1 2001-01-10 - BLEED VALVE

Title (en)

BLEED VALVE

Title (de)

ABBLASVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE DE PURGE

Publication

EP 0722539 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95926358 A

Priority

  • CA 9500462 W
  • US 28838094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5477673A] The present invention discloses a bleed valve for use in gas turbine engines. The valve has a piston, one end of which is positioned inside a housing which is positioned on one side of the by pass fluid flow path. The other end of the piston is positioned in an opening between the primary fluid flow path and the bypass fluid path such that the valve opens and closes in response to a pressure differential between two points in the primary fluid flow path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 27/02; F02K 3/075

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 9/18 (2006.01); F02K 3/075 (2006.01); F04D 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 27/0215 (2013.01); F02K 3/075 (2013.01); F04D 27/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5477673 A 19951226; CA 2172292 A1 19960222; CA 2172292 C 19990126; CZ 285944 B6 19991215; CZ 9600853 A3 19960717; DE 69519846 D1 20010215; DE 69519846 T2 20010531; EP 0722539 A1 19960724; EP 0722539 B1 20010110; JP 3650401 B2 20050518; JP H09504075 A 19970422; PL 177552 B1 19991231; PL 313906 A1 19960805; RU 2119100 C1 19980920; WO 9605438 A1 19960222

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120808

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120808

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110818

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110803

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100302

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-08-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050808

2004-03-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-08-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030809

2002-07-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020715

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69519846 20010215

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PRATT & WHITNEY CANADA CORP.

1997-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970423

1996-07-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960404

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE