Global Patent Index - EP 0722680 A3

EP 0722680 A3 2000-12-06 - Drawer

Title (en)

Drawer

Title (de)

Schublade

Title (fr)

Tiroir

Publication

EP 0722680 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 95120476 A

Priority

AT 7695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0722680A2] Each drawer frame piece (2) has only one single protuberance (26) on the lower horizontal arm (24) of the lateral U-section. The protuberance fits into a groove (17) above it and is positioned at or near the front end of the horizontal arm. The fixtures attaching the drawer frame pieces to the front panel have a flexible element enabling the frame pieces to tilt on the front panel without coming out. The back ends of the drawer frame pieces have lateral pins fitting into openings in one side arm of the back wall.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/941 (2017.01); A47B 2088/951 (2017.01); A47B 2210/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0722680 A2 19960724; EP 0722680 A3 20001206; AT 404219 B 19980925; AT A7695 A 19980215; CN 1135864 A 19961120; JP 3031495 U 19961129; US 5971516 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091029 AND 20091104

2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020403

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010920

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT