Global Patent Index - EP 0722777 B1

EP 0722777 B1 2000-05-31 - Method for processing slag from waste incineration plants

Title (en)

Method for processing slag from waste incineration plants

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Aufbereiten von Schlacke aus Müllverbrennungsanlagen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de scories provenant d'installations d'incinération de déchets

Publication

EP 0722777 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810783 A

Priority

  • DE 19501830 A
  • DE 19508293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0722777A1] The method involves raw slag being separated into at least two fractions and the first fraction has a particle size of up to 80 mm, pref. 32 mm in a first phase. The screen overflow from the first phase is supplied to the wet slag separator (4). The through-fall through the screen and through the fire rack is sent to a second screen phase (5) to separate the fine material. The screen overflow from the second phase is mechanically pulverised after sorting out the metal and inert materials and the through-fall from the second phase is sent to a melting furnace (7) for separate processing. A third screen phase (8) can be included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/04 (2006.01); C04B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03B 9/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0722777 A1 19960724; EP 0722777 B1 20000531; AT 193466 T 20000615; DK 0722777 T3 20001009; ES 2148466 T3 20001016; JP 4149529 B2 20080910; JP H08229430 A 19960910; KR 100404642 B1 20040128; NO 309365 B1 20010122; NO 960233 A 19960722; NO 960233 D0 19960119; PT 722777 E 20001130; TW 277101 B 19960601; US 5671688 A 19970930

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151212

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151221

2016-02-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 193466

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20151211

2016-02-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20151210

2015-12-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20151210

2015-12-21 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: MAXIMUM VALIDITY LIMIT REACHED

- Effective date: 20151211

2015-12-16 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20151210

2015-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-12-14 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUP

- Effective date: 20151211

2015-12-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59508422

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141226

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: WAGNER PATENT AG, CH

2009-11-13 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2003-12-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Free Format Text: MARTIN GMBH FUR UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK DE

- Effective date: 20031104

2003-12-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-12-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2003-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ZIMMERLI, WAGNER & PARTNER AG

2003-10-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MARTIN GMBH FUER UMWELT- UND ENERGIETECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Free Format Text: 20020130 *ALSTOM

2002-11-29 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2002-11-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2002-11-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2002-06-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2002-02-28 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Free Format Text: ALSTOM FR

- Effective date: 20011109

2002-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: GIACOMO BOLIS C/O ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG TRANSFER- ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-01-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ALSTOM

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148466

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-07-31 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508422

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-06

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 193466

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990809

1997-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961223

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE