Global Patent Index - EP 0722884 B1

EP 0722884 B1 2000-12-13 - Device and method for controlling the speed of a ship

Title (en)

Device and method for controlling the speed of a ship

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Geschwindigkeitsregelung eines Schiffes

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé de réglage de la vitesse d'un navire

Publication

EP 0722884 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400103 A

Priority

FR 9500589 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0722884A1] The engines (1,2) are coupled selectively by clutches (3,4) to a common speed redn. gear (5) having a single output gearwheel (11) which drives the propeller shaft (7). The friction brake (6) is constituted by a disc (13) which can be immobilised by grippers (14) to prevent rotation of an input gearwheel (12) in mesh with the output gearwheel. Actual speed of the ship, and parameters representing the operating conditions of the engines, gearing, brake, clutches and propeller, are measured and compared with desired values. Optimal control commands are deduced so that the max. performance obtd. from the engines, clutches and brake does not exceed specified limits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63H 21/14; B63H 21/22; B63H 23/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 23/16 (2006.01); B63H 21/14 (2006.01); B63H 21/21 (2006.01); B63H 21/22 (2006.01); B63H 23/30 (2006.01); B63H 23/35 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 21/22 (2013.01); B63H 21/14 (2013.01); B63H 23/30 (2013.01); B63H 2023/328 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0722884 A1 19960724; EP 0722884 B1 20001213; BR 9600161 A 19980106; CN 1065828 C 20010516; CN 1137462 A 19961211; DE 69611188 D1 20010118; DE 69611188 T2 20010719; DK 0722884 T3 20010212; ES 2153542 T3 20010301; FI 960236 A0 19960117; FI 960236 A 19960720; FR 2729637 A1 19960726; FR 2729637 B1 19970418; JP H08230788 A 19960910; NO 960204 A 19960722; NO 960204 D0 19960117; PL 179390 B1 20000831; PL 312396 A1 19960722; US 5618211 A 19970408

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050116

2003-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20031022

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-08-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-16 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153542

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-02-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010213

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUZZI, NOTARO&ANTONIELLI D'OULX

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-01-18 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69611188

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-18

2001-01-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010116

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010112

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981201

1997-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961212

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE