Global Patent Index - EP 0722898 B1

EP 0722898 B1 2000-04-26 - A method of conveying sheet material

Title (en)

A method of conveying sheet material

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Fördern von Bogenmaterial

Title (fr)

Procédé de transport de feuilles.

Publication

EP 0722898 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96830015 A

Priority

IT BO950008 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0722898A1] In a method of conveying sheet material (27, 4) along a selected feed path (9), typically toward a wrapping station, at least a part of the path (9) coincides with a conveyor device (29) to which the material (27, 4) clings by electrostatic attraction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/00; B65B 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/22 (2006.01); B65B 41/02 (2006.01); B65G 15/00 (2006.01); B65H 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 41/02 (2013.01); B65H 5/004 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0722898 A1 19960724; EP 0722898 B1 20000426; DE 69607863 D1 20000531; DE 69607863 T2 20001019; IT 1278159 B1 19971117; IT BO950008 A1 19960717; IT BO950008 D0 19950117; JP H08230820 A 19960910

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050117

2001-11-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-09-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-09-05 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010117

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607863 20000531

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971203

1997-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961113

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT