Global Patent Index - EP 0723028 B1

EP 0723028 B1 2000-05-31 - Sheet and plate of alloyed zinc

Title (en)

Sheet and plate of alloyed zinc

Title (de)

Bänder und Tafeln aus legiertem Zink

Title (fr)

Bandes et plaques en alliage de zinc

Publication

EP 0723028 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119186 A

Priority

DE 4446771 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723028A2] In strips and sheets of alloyed zinc based on fine zinc of at least 99.99% purity with addns. of 0.05-0.2 wt.% Ti, 0.02-0.2 wt.% Cu and 0.005-0.05 wt.% Al, pref. for constructional applications, the novelty comprises either (a) the addn. of 0.005-0.04 wt.% Mg or 0.01-0.1 wt.% Li; or (b) the addn. of 0.005-0.0075 wt.% Mg and 0.01-0.45 wt.% Li. Also claimed are processes for prodn. of the above strips and sheets by continuous casting the above alloys to strip between circulating metal belts, immediately followed by multistage rolling to the prescribed thickness, the last rolling stage being above or below the recrystallisation temp.. Pref. the finish rolling temp. is 100-250 (esp. 100-170) degrees C for the Zn alloy contg. addn. (a). The last rolling stage for the Zn alloy contg. addn. (b) is below the recrystallisation temp., the strip pref. being cold rolled and then reheated at 150-300 degrees C for 0.75-2.5 hrs..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 18/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 18/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 18/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 4446771 A1 19960627; EP 0723028 A2 19960724; EP 0723028 A3 19961016; EP 0723028 B1 20000531; ES 2148413 T3 20001016; SI 9500382 A 19960630

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051206

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021207

2002-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-09-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020701

2002-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RHEINZINK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011231

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-18 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010118

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20001229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001207

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148413 T3

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508423 20000706

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL

1997-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970710

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970416

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL