Global Patent Index - EP 0723038 B1

EP 0723038 B1 2000-04-12 - Process and apparatus for regenerating a used etching solution for zirconium alloys

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for regenerating a used etching solution for zirconium alloys

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regenerierung von verbrauchten Ätzlösungen für Zirkoniumlegierungen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de régénération d'une solution usagée de décapage d'éléments en alliage de zirconium

Publication

EP 0723038 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400097 A

Priority

FR 9500783 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723038A1] Regenerating a spent HF-HNO3 pickling soln., after being used for Zr alloy pickling, involves (a) vacuum evaporating and then condensing most of the water content of the soln. to obtain slightly acidic water and a conc. acid soln. contaminated by ZrF4; (b) vacuum evaporating the conc. acid soln. in a crystalliser to obtain ZrF4 crystals and a purified conc. acid soln.; and (c) mixing the slightly acidic water and the conc. acid soln. in the desired proportion to obtain a regenerated pickling soln. Also claimed is an appts. for carrying out the above process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23G 1/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23G 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23G 1/36 (2013.01); Y10S 423/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0723038 A1 19960724; EP 0723038 B1 20000412; DE 69607660 D1 20000518; DE 69607660 T2 20001228; ES 2145390 T3 20000701; FR 2729676 A1 19960726; FR 2729676 B1 19970411; US 5788935 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040115

2004-08-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CEZUS CIE EUROPEENNE DU ZIRCONIUM

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040115

2003-12-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-02-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030108

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030107

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2000-12-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Free text: ZIRCOTUBE TRANSFER- COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE DU ZIRCONIUM-CEZUS

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145390 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607660 20000518

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI SE

1998-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980902

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970111

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB LI SE