Global Patent Index - EP 0723044 B1

EP 0723044 B1 2000-02-09 - Method for manufacturing a nonwoven based on lactic acid

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a nonwoven based on lactic acid

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Vliesstoffes aus Milchsäure

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un non-tissé à base d'acide lactique

Publication

EP 0723044 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95470033 A

Priority

FR 9412332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723044A2] Process for prodn. of a non-woven fabric from molten polymer comprises: (a) melt spinning the polymer(s), (b) cooling, (c) drawing the filaments, (d) laying up the fibres on a mat, (e) heat bonding the fibres by calendering to form a web, and (f) fixation treating the prod. with adjustment of the degree of crystallinity and of the internal stress of the fibres making up the non-woven fabrics. Also claimed are: (i) the nonwoven polymeric fabric; and (ii) appts. for prodn. of the nonwoven polymeric fabric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/42; D04H 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 6/62 (2006.01); C08G 63/06 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01); D04H 1/54 (2012.01); D04H 1/556 (2012.01); D04H 3/14 (2012.01); D04H 3/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/54 (2013.01); D04H 1/556 (2013.01); D04H 3/14 (2013.01); D04H 3/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0723044 A2 19960724; EP 0723044 A3 19960904; EP 0723044 B1 20000209; AT 189710 T 20000215; CA 2160313 A1 19960413; DE 69515017 D1 20000316; DE 69515017 T2 20001102; DK 0723044 T3 20000724; ES 2145242 T3 20000701; FR 2725731 A1 19960419; FR 2725731 B1 19961213; JP H09170152 A 19970630; US 5833787 A 19981110

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051004

2004-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031004

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20011113

2004-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040501

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *FIBERWEB FRANCE

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031005

2003-10-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031004

2002-12-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20021219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20021031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021028

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021016

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-11 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-10-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-10-04 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

2000-07-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145242 T3

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG HELMLE-KOLB & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND M

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-05-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515017 20000316

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-02-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 189710 T 20000215

2000-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EHRET, PHILIPPE

2000-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUIPOUY, PHILIPPE

2000-02-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAHTENKORVA, KIMMO

1999-07-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A NONWOVEN BASED ON LACTIC ACID

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980622

1996-11-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960913

1996-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FIBERWEB FRANCE SA

1996-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

1996-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EHRET, PHILIPPE

1996-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUIPOUY, PHILIPPE

1996-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAHTENKORVA, KIMMO

1996-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES GB GR IT LI LU NL SE