Global Patent Index - EP 0723750 B1

EP 0723750 B1 2000-07-19 - Watchbands and method for their manufacture

Title (en)

Watchbands and method for their manufacture

Title (de)

Uhren-Armband und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Bracelets de montres et leur procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0723750 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100513 A

Priority

DE 19501952 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723750A2] The watch has a flexible core formed in one piece with spaced apart spacer members (20). The latter are used to fix receptacle sections (61) to the core for decorative elements (16). Spacer elements (16) are arranged in the receptacle sections (61). The core has a first, expandable, soft core element (18) with a channel (22) for a second core element (24), and has a second flexible core element (24) which is comparatively rigid. The spacer members (20) are formed integrally on the first core element (18). The decorative elements are formed as a one piece sleeve body. The first core element (18) preferably has a U-shaped cross-section to form the channel (22) for the second element (24). The cross-section of the channel (22) corresponds to that of the second element (24). Alternatively, the first core element may be in the form of a tube corresponding to the second element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/10; A44C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/0076 (2013.01); A44C 5/025 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19501952 A1 19960725; EP 0723750 A2 19960731; EP 0723750 A3 19970416; EP 0723750 B1 20000719; EP 0723750 B2 20050209; US 5630329 A 19970520

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070116

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070116

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070116

2007-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20070628

2006-03-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-27 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-01-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060123

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-01-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-02 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-02-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050209

2005-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MONTRES RADO S.A.

- Effective date: 20010419

2000-11-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-10-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605607 20000824

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990426

1997-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970318

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-03-26 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A44C 5/10

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT