Global patent index - EP 0723817 B1

EP 0723817 B1 2001-04-18 - Booth for treating workpieces by spraying

Title (en)

Booth for treating workpieces by spraying

Title (de)

Kabine zur Spritzbehandlung von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Cabine de traitement de pièces par pulvérisation

Publication

EP 0723817 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96450001 A

Priority

FR 9501181 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723817A1] Part (36) of the curved rear cabin wall (16), actuator-operated (43), swings aside on pivoted (38) support arms (40). One arm (60) of the carrousel (12), carrying the next workpiece on a turntable (62), enters the cabin as the hub (58) rotates on a vertical axis, just outside. Reclosing the rear, the operator sprays glazing enamel through a front opening (48), using a piston applicator and rotating the workpiece by engaging a belt drive within the arm (60). Further workpieces are meantime mounted on following turntables. Inclined air-curtains (50, 52) protect the operator. Air circulation (56) facilitates the deposition of excess fluid, which runs down the walls into a basin for re-use. Corner fitments (46) contain extraction vents and lighting.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 13/02; B05B 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 13/02 (2006.01); B05B 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 13/0228 (2013.01); B05B 13/0242 (2013.01); B05B 15/1222 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0723817 A1 19960731; EP 0723817 B1 20010418; DE 69612519 D1 20010523; FR 2729871 A1 19960802; FR 2729871 B1 19970425

INPADOC legal status

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2001-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011030

2001-10-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2001-07-19 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-07-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010718

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69612519

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT

2001-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-07-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000602

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970115

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI PT