Global Patent Index - EP 0723839 B1

EP 0723839 B1 2000-01-26 - Torque wrench

Title (en)

Torque wrench

Title (de)

Drehmomentschlüssel

Title (fr)

Clé dynamométrique

Publication

EP 0723839 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95118584 A

Priority

DE 29501355 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723839A1] The torque wrench has a first shaft (4) with a handle on its outer end, a second shaft (5) rigidly attached to the tool head (1), a pivot bolt (6) linking the shafts with its axis perpendicular to the tightening direction, a spring-loaded locking element and an evaluation unit. The locking element, which is mounted between shaft holders (9,11), locks the shafts together below a defined torque level and releases them above it to enable limited relative movement. A measurement element (20) measures the material stresses acting on one shaft. The evaluation unit converts the measurement value into a torque which is displayed (18) with the defined torque value.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/143

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/142 (2006.01); B25B 23/143 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/1425 (2013.01); B25B 23/1427 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29501355 U1 19950302; EP 0723839 A1 19960731; EP 0723839 B1 20000126

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051125

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-16 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-07-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-11-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021126

2002-11-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021125

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011114

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011106

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-05 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011105

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-10-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011012

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507696 20000302

2000-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000127

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970416

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960820

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE