Global Patent Index - EP 0723920 B1

EP 0723920 B1 2000-04-05 - Temporary container for printing ink

Title (en)

Temporary container for printing ink

Title (de)

Temporärer Behälter für Druckfarbe

Title (fr)

Récipient temporaire pour encre d'impression

Publication

EP 0723920 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96100940 A

Priority

CH 20695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723920A1] The container, e.g. for ink used in copper-plate engraving, consists of an outer package (10) of a rigid material, in the shape of a right prism, and an inner package (24) of a flexible material in the form of a back which can be hermetically sealed. The outer package is of cardboard, and preferably corrugated cardboard, and has an octagonal cross-section formed by a square with cut-away corners. It is designed to be carried on a standard European pallet or a sub-division of it, having a width or length of 80 cm. The inner package is made from two lengths of a flexible material, joined by adhesive or welding along their long edges. The flexible material is composite and synthetic, comprising a layer which is impermeable to gas and preferably also to light. It has an inner layer of a polyolefin 70 to 100 mcm thick, an intermediate layer of aluminium 9-12 mcm thick, and an outer polyester layer of 8-15 mcm thick. The inner polyolefin layer can be, for example, of polyethylene, and polyurethane can be used in place of polyester for the outer one.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 77/06; B41F 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B65D 77/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/062 (2013.01); B41F 31/02 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29600994 U1 19960314; DE 69607497 D1 20000511; DE 69607497 T2 20000907; EP 0723920 A1 19960731; EP 0723920 B1 20000405; FR 2729930 A3 19960802

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160122

2016-02-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160122

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-01-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69607497

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141219

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69607497

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2012-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69607497

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2011-05-20 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2011-05-20 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2011-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2011-02-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110106 AND 20110112

2010-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP WENGER RYFFEL AG

2010-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SICPA HOLDING SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-08-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NOMA HOLDING S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2009-01-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080124

2008-09-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-12-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607497

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-11

2000-04-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-04-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SICPA HOLDING S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981013

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970111

1996-12-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1996-07-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI

1996-07-31 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: LT;LV;SI