Global Patent Index - EP 0723926 B1

EP 0723926 B1 2000-02-16 - A spinning cone and a process and device for the manufacture thereof

Title (en)

A spinning cone and a process and device for the manufacture thereof

Title (de)

Konische Spinnereihülse und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Cône de filature et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0723926 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500170 A

Priority

ES 9500064 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0723926A2] The cone is made from cardboard or the like and is adapted to be supplied in stacked form with one cone (1) partially nested in an immediately adjacent cone. It is provided with a plurality of embossments (2, 2a, 2b) extending from the inner surface of the cone, being equidistant and close to the apex or smaller base (5) of the cone (1), and the respective most outstanding zones or peaks are at like distances from the inner surface of the cone (1). In the manufacture thereof, a conventional cone (1) is subjected to an inwardly directed stamping operation, deforming it and forming external dimples (13) which form embossments (2, 2a, 2b) projecting out from the inner surface. This stamping operation is performed with a first rotating tool (12), provided with dimples (13), and a second rotating tool (14) provided with protuberances (15) complementary to the dimples (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/10 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01); B65H 2701/534 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0723926 A2 19960731; EP 0723926 A3 19970416; EP 0723926 B1 20000216; ES 2126423 A1 19990316; ES 2126423 B1 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051219

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041219

2004-12-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041219

2003-12-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031119

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1998-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TEXPACK ENGINEERING, S.A.

1998-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971118

1997-12-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971015

1997-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT