Global Patent Index - EP 0724060 B1

EP 0724060 B1 2000-07-12 - Window winder operated by unified kinematic chain

Title (en)

Window winder operated by unified kinematic chain

Title (de)

Fensterheber welcher von einer einheitlichen kinematischen Kette angetrieben wird

Title (fr)

Lève-glace entraîné par une chaîne cinématique unifiée

Publication

EP 0724060 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500169 A

Priority

ES 9500149 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0724060A1] A window winder operated by a unified kinematic chain, in which the movement of the kinematic chain is carried out by means of a rotating member operated either manually (8,10) or electrically (9), with the chain being common to both, of either the sealed (closed) or open type, based on a cable, a toothed belt, chain, worm-screw - rack ... etc. The operating or drive system is interchangeable, and can be adapted to one system or the other, without having to modify any details of the vehicle door or of the said chain. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 11/48; E05F 11/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/48 (2006.01); E05F 11/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 11/483 (2013.01); E05F 11/505 (2013.01); E05F 11/486 (2013.01); E05F 11/488 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0724060 A1 19960731; EP 0724060 B1 20000712; DE 69517943 D1 20000817; DE 69517943 T2 20010301; ES 2120318 A1 19981016; ES 2120318 B1 19990516; ES 2148461 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061216

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061216

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051214

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148461 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69517943 20000817

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-13 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: GRUPO ANTOLIN-INGENIERIA, S.A.

1997-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970217

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961114

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT