Global Patent Index - EP 0724205 B1

EP 0724205 B1 2000-04-05 - Watch with a radio signal controlled correction function

Title (en)

Watch with a radio signal controlled correction function

Title (de)

Uhr mit durch Funksignale kontrolierter Korrekturfunktion

Title (fr)

Montre avec fonction de correction par signal radio

Publication

EP 0724205 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96300466 A

Priority

  • JP 1165095 A
  • JP 31772595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0724205A2] In a multifunction watch having as an object the provision of a radio-signal-controlled time correction function, a receiving enabling means (41) is provided which enables operation of a time code receiving means (42) only when a display contents selection means is selecting the contents of a time-measuring means. Additionally, either a function mode stopping means which stops the function mode operating means or a function mode display prohibiting means is provided for the case in which this receiving enabling means is enabling operation of the time code receiving means. This enables the achievement of a high-performance receiving circuit by preventing the simultaneous operation of the time code receiving means and the function mode operating means, the latter operating at high speed and having a high noise level, which leads to deterioration of receiving performance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04G 5/00; G04C 3/14; G04C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/14 (2006.01); G04G 5/00 (2013.01); G04R 20/08 (2013.01); G04R 20/10 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 3/14 (2013.01); G04R 20/08 (2013.01); G04R 20/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0724205 A2 19960731; EP 0724205 A3 19970502; EP 0724205 B1 20000405; DE 69607499 D1 20000511; DE 69607499 T2 20001019

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160123

2016-02-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160123

2016-01-24 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69607499

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607499 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980612

1998-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971031

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB