Global patent index - EP 0724245 B1

EP 0724245 B1 2000-01-26 - Passive infra-red detector evaluating the spectrum of heat radiation emitted by an object

Title (en)

Passive infra-red detector evaluating the spectrum of heat radiation emitted by an object

Title (de)

Passiver Infrarot-Melder, der die von einem Objekt emittierte Wärmestrahlung spektral auswertet

Title (fr)

Détecteur passif à rayonnement infrarouge permettant l'évaluation du spectre émis par un objet

Publication

EP 0724245 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100813 A

Priority

DE 19502521 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0724245A1] The sensor (3) breaks down the incident infrared radiation into four spectral channels for which corresp. wavelength-dependent electrical signals (A1-A4) are produced. These signals are filtered (4) and their amplitudes are evaluated (5) for presentation to a logic unit (6). The spectral fundamental patterns of emission characteristics of a variety of infrared sources are stored in the memory (7). The mean voltage amplitude over the entire wavelength range is used as a basis for comparison. If correspondence to the stored patterns lies within allowed limits, the source is identified and an alarm given.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/19; G01J 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/19 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0724245 A1 19960731; EP 0724245 B1 20000126; AT 189330 T 20000215; DE 19502521 A1 19960801

INPADOC legal status

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030120

2002-09-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020926

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-12-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011212

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20011128

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604261

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189330

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL

1999-08-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990713

1997-02-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961221

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE