Global Patent Index - EP 0724273 B1

EP 0724273 B1 2000-05-24 - Magnet device with superconducting winding to be cooled by enforced cooling

Title (en)

Magnet device with superconducting winding to be cooled by enforced cooling

Title (de)

Magneteinrichtung mit forciert zu kühlender supraleitender Wicklung

Title (fr)

Dispositif magnétique avec enroulement supraconducteur à refroidissement forcé

Publication

EP 0724273 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100489 A

Priority

DE 19502549 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0724273A2] The magnet arrangement (20 includes a coil housing (16) containing a superconducting coil (10). The coil is forcibly cooled, and the coil housing is vacuum-sealed. The electrical connection lead (20a,20b) of the winding (3) is separated from the cooling medium inlet and outlet (18a,18b). The coil housing is surrounded by a vacuum chamber (22) for thermal insulation, and the coil is composed of several double-pancake windings. The cooling medium is LN2 or LHe, and the superconductor is made of a high Tc superconducting material. The winding core (7) is made of a synthetic material, e.g. GFK or CFK.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 6/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 6/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 6/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0724273 A2 19960731; EP 0724273 A3 19961016; EP 0724273 B1 20000524; DE 19502549 A1 19960801

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2003-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030115

2002-03-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020110

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000612

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605270

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-29

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990217

1997-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961118

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB