Global patent index - EP 0724396 B1

EP 0724396 B1 2000-03-15 - ZONED CELLULAR CUSHION

Title (en)

ZONED CELLULAR CUSHION

Title (de)

IN ABSCHNITTE UNTERTEILTES ZELLENKISSEN

Title (fr)

COUSSIN ALVEOLAIRE A ZONES

Publication

EP 0724396 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94900555 A

Priority

  • US 9310665 W
  • US 97584992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9410881A1] An inflatable cushion (A) having a series of separately inflatable zones (n, s, t, u) with tubular conduits (20, 21, 22, 23) leading from each zone (n, s, t, u) beneath or on top of the cushion (A) within the periphery of the cushion to a common manifold (24) spaced outwardly from the front edge of the cushion with a fill tube (25) connected to the manifold (24) and individual cut-off valves (30) or a means to buckle the tubes for each conduit whereby the zones can be filled and bled simultaneously or selectively.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 27/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 27/081 (2013.01); A47C 27/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9410881 A1 19940526; CA 2146543 A1 19940526; CA 2146543 C 19980120; DE 69328127 D1 20000420; DE 69328127 T2 20000824; EP 0724396 A1 19960807; EP 0724396 A4 19960424; EP 0724396 B1 20000315; ES 2144044 T3 20000601; JP 3706388 B2 20051012; JP H08503152 A 19960409

INPADOC legal status

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101105

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101104

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69328127

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101104

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-03-19 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2010-02-12 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-12-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091126 AND 20091202

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2144044

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69328127

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1997-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970416

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19950428

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1996-04-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

1996-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB