Global Patent Index - EP 0724398 B1

EP 0724398 B1 2001-12-19 - DRINKS CUP FOR PUBLIC USE

Title (en)

DRINKS CUP FOR PUBLIC USE

Title (de)

TRINKBECHER ZUR ÖFFENTLICHEN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

TASSE A USAGE PUBLIC

Publication

EP 0724398 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94929635 A

Priority

  • IT 9400172 W
  • IT BA930025 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9510966A1] The object of the invention is to provide a cup used to serve coffee, tea, milk and other similar drinks, particularly suitable to be used in public premises, in order to assure the maximum hygiene and avoid the danger of infections. The cup is constituted by a container (1) made of ceramic or other proper material, of any shape and dimension, and a waterproof film (4) of proper material, for example, plastic. The container (1) and the film (4) have particular technical devices (2, 5) in order to assure the film (4) irremovability during the use and the perfect adhesion of the same to the container surface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 23/0216 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9510966 A1 19950427; AU 1807795 A 19950508; DE 69429529 D1 20020131; DE 69429529 T2 20020808; EP 0724398 A1 19960807; EP 0724398 B1 20011219; ES 2170775 T3 20020816; IT 1268455 B1 19970304; IT BA930025 A1 19950424; IT BA930025 D0 19931022

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DE BELLIS DOMENICO

- Effective date: 20041031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DE BELLIS FRANCESCO

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041018

2005-10-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051017

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DE BELLIS DOMENICO

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DE BELLIS FRANCESCO

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2004-01-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-12-03 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-06-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170775 T3

2002-06-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SPIERENBURG HELMLE-KOLB & PARTNER AG PATENT- UND M

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69429529 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980318

1996-08-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960502

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI