Global patent index - EP 0724399 B1

EP 0724399 B1 2000-04-12 - MOVEMENT RESISTANT ANGLED CLOTHES HANGER ROD STRUCTURE

Title (en)

MOVEMENT RESISTANT ANGLED CLOTHES HANGER ROD STRUCTURE

Title (de)

STANGENKONSTRUKTION FÜR UNBEWEGLICHE, SCHRÄGE KLEIDERBÜGEL

Title (fr)

STRUCTURE DE BARRE SERVANT A MAINTENIR DES CINTRES EN BIAIS SANS QU'ILS PUISSENT SE DEPLACER

Publication

EP 0724399 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94924456 A

Priority

  • US 9407666 W
  • US 13951993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9510968A1] A space-saving clothes hanger rod structure (10) is provided which holds clothes hangers (11), and clothes hanging thereon, in an optimal angled position within a closet. There is provided a generally V-shaped rod (10), when viewed in cross section, including two upwardly extending members (15, 16) extending at an angle up from a common base point (17), defining a V-shaped gap therebetween. Both of the upwardly extending members (15, 16) contain at their respective outer, spaced-apart edges (15b, 16b) a plurality of respective longitudinally spaced slot-like channels (18a-c), each channel being adapted to receive a portion of the arcuate surface (19a) of a hanger hook, so that the respective hanger hooks are held in place at two spaced-apart points along the arcuate surface (19a) of the hook. As a result, the respective hanger hooks (11) are prevented from moving and rotating off of the angle of the channel (18a-c), preferably about 50 degrees. Therefore, clothes may be hung within a closet having a minimal depth therein.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47H 1/02; A47B 61/00; A47G 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 61/00 (2006.01); A47G 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 61/003 (2013.01); A47G 25/0692 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9510968 A1 19950427; AU 7471794 A 19950508; CA 2174535 A1 19950427; DE 69423974 D1 20000518; DE 69423974 T2 20001207; EP 0724399 A1 19960807; EP 0724399 A4 19961218; EP 0724399 B1 20000412

INPADOC legal status

2004-03-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2004-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030708

2004-02-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-07-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-07-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030708

2002-07-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020724

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-15 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020704

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-08 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69423974

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-18

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-04-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-04-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000412

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980114

1996-12-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19961106

1996-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-10-16 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: FILLIOS, AUGUSTUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1996-10-16 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONEKE, WALTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1996-10-16 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: KONEKE, HANS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1996-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FILLIOS, AUGUSTUS

1996-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KONEKE, WALTER

1996-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KONEKE, HANS

1996-10-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FILLIOS, GEORGE

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960517

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE