Global Patent Index - EP 0724500 B1

EP 0724500 B1 2000-10-11 - IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO GRINDING MACHINES

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN AND RELATING TO GRINDING MACHINES

Title (de)

SCHLEIFMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINES A RECTIFIER AMELIOREES

Publication

EP 0724500 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94930282 A

Priority

  • GB 9402302 W
  • GB 9321639 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9511110A1] A grinding machine having a relatively movable worktable (64) and grinding wheel (66) which can be swivelled, the positions of a tailstock (62) and workrests (60, 61) being adjustable by computer controlled drive means relative to the worktable to enable different components (and parts thereof) to be ground on the same machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 19/12; B24B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/12 (2006.01); B24B 41/06 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 19/12 (2013.01); B24B 41/065 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

JP H0531667 A 19930209 - OKUMA MACHINERY WORKS LTD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9511110 A1 19950427; AU 7944494 A 19950508; DE 69426125 D1 20001116; DE 69426125 T2 20010510; EP 0724500 A1 19960807; EP 0724500 B1 20001011; ES 2150995 T3 20001216; GB 9321639 D0 19931208

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061021

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061021

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051017

- Year of fee payment: 12

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150995

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-12-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69426125

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO INGG. FISCHETTI & WEBER

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1998-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNOVA U.K. LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970221

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960409

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT