Global Patent Index - EP 0724680 B1

EP 0724680 B1 2000-03-01 - SHUTTERING JOIST FOR BRICKLAYING WORK OVER WINDOW AND DOOR OPENINGS

Title (en)

SHUTTERING JOIST FOR BRICKLAYING WORK OVER WINDOW AND DOOR OPENINGS

Title (de)

SCHALUNGSBALKEN FÜR MAUERWERK ÜBER FENSTER- UND TÜRÖFFNUNGEN

Title (fr)

POUTRELLE DE COFFRAGE POUR MACONNAGE AU-DESSUS D'UNE BAIE DE PORTE OU DE FENETRE

Publication

EP 0724680 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94931240 A

Priority

  • SE 9400919 W
  • SE 9303505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9511358A1] A lintel for masonry above windows and doorways, comprising an L-shaped sheet-metal angle profile. The angle profile is provided with a substantially horizontal base shank part (11) which is provided with a declining flange (14) on the edge which is opposite from the side which supports a back shank part (12), which back shank part (12) is directed upwards from said base shank part and is connected to supplementary sheet metal parts (15, 17, 20). Together these parts from a closed section together with the rear side of the back shank part. After completion of the wall, the profile forms a lintel that serves as a remaining lead off for rain water from the rear side of the wall to its front side. In position of use, the closed profile section extends for some distance below the underside of the lower edge of the base shank part (11). Also, the profile section comprises a sheet metal part (20) which is parallel to the underside of the base shank part and forms a support surface along the inside of the wall, in level with the lower edge of the flange (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/02 (2006.01); E04C 3/07 (2006.01); E04C 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7046 (2013.01); E04C 3/02 (2013.01); E04C 3/07 (2013.01); E04C 2003/023 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0421 (2013.01); E04C 2003/043 (2013.01); E04C 2003/0439 (2013.01); E04C 2003/046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK GB IE NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9511358 A1 19950427; AU 8007594 A 19950508; DE 69423227 D1 20000406; EP 0724680 A1 19960807; EP 0724680 B1 20000301; FI 961715 A0 19960419; FI 961715 A 19960419; NO 314095 B1 20030127; NO 961523 A 19960603; NO 961523 D0 19960417; PL 314232 A1 19960902; SE 502889 C2 19960212; SE 9303505 D0 19931022; SE 9303505 L 19950423

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-08 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001003

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-10-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000603

2000-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423227 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB IE NL SE

2000-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990304

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960412

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK GB IE NL SE