Global Patent Index - EP 0724686 B1

EP 0724686 B1 2001-04-04 - CONTROL OF FUELLING RATE OF AN ENGINE

Title (en)

CONTROL OF FUELLING RATE OF AN ENGINE

Title (de)

STEUERUNG DER KRAFTSTOFFZUFUHRRATE EINES MOTORS

Title (fr)

REGULATION DE L'ALIMENTATION EN CARBURANT D'UN MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0724686 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94930864 A

Priority

  • AU 9400639 W
  • AU PM194993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9511377A1] Disclosed is a method of controlling the mass of fuel delivered to an engine subject to a change in engine load demand comprising determining a rate of change of fuel required per cycle with time in response to the change in engine load demand; and, applying a filter constant to the determined rate of change of fuel required per cycle with time to maintain a value of the rate of change of fuel required per cycle of the engine with time at no greater than a predetermined threshold level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/10; F02D 33/00; F02D 41/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 43/00 (2006.01); F02D 11/10 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1497 (2013.01); F02D 41/045 (2013.01); F02D 43/00 (2013.01); F02D 11/105 (2013.01); F02D 41/3023 (2013.01); F02D 2041/1432 (2013.01); F02D 2041/389 (2013.01); F02D 2200/1012 (2013.01); F02D 2400/04 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0433671 A2 19910626 - NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9511377 A1 19950427; BR 9407872 A 19961029; CA 2171623 A1 19950427; CN 1055521 C 20000816; CN 1133628 A 19961016; DE 69427032 D1 20010510; DE 69427032 T2 20010719; EP 0724686 A1 19960807; EP 0724686 A4 19980506; EP 0724686 B1 20010404; ES 2155482 T3 20010516; JP 3727340 B2 20051214; JP H09504068 A 19970422

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081020

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071022

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071022

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071009

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061018

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-10-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2004-10-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041006

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155482 T3

2001-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69427032 20010510

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-04-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-03-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

1998-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980629

1998-05-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1998-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960411

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE