Global Patent Index - EP 0724958 B2

EP 0724958 B2 2001-05-02 - Printing machine with withdrawable parts

Title (en)

Printing machine with withdrawable parts

Title (de)

Druckmaschine mit herausnehmbaren Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression avec des organes demontables

Publication

EP 0724958 B2 (DE)

Application

EP 96100422 A

Priority

DE 19503695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0724958A1] The print machine, especially offset printers with exchangeable components such as colour, moisture and paint drums has an integrity test facility to check for the correct assembly of its components. Each removable component (1) has a permanent magnet (3). The resulting magnetic field is detected by a sensor (8) which generates a signal which is passed to a check unit. The sensor is fixed in a trunnion or locating journal (5) of the print drum or other component.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/24 (2006.01); B41F 31/30 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); B41F 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/0018 (2013.01); B41F 33/00 (2013.01); B41P 2233/20 (2013.01)

Citation (opposition)

Opponent :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0724958 A1 19960807; EP 0724958 B1 19980812; EP 0724958 B2 20010502; AT 169563 T 19980815; DE 19503695 A1 19960808; DE 19503695 C2 19970227; JP 2771504 B2 19980702; JP H08252907 A 19961001; US 5787813 A 19980804

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59600407

- Effective date: 20130801

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130801

2012-07-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MANROLAND AG, 63075 OFFENBACH, DE

- Document: DE 59600407

- Effective date: 20120510

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120210

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110112

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-12-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-01-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040112

2002-12-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-06-08 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2001-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2001-05-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20010502

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 19990131

1999-07-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KOENIG & BAUER AG

- Effective date: 19990511

1999-02-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

1999-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 19990131

1998-11-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19981112

1998-09-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59600407 19980917

1998-09-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 19980814

1998-09-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

1998-08-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

1998-08-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

1998-08-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-08-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 19980812

1998-08-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 169563 T 19980815

1998-04-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1997-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970127

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960124

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE