Global Patent Index - EP 0725024 B1

EP 0725024 B1 2000-04-26 - Sheet feeding device having a movable bearing means cooperating in the guiding of the sheets along a transfer path and acted on by a pushing means

Title (en)

Sheet feeding device having a movable bearing means cooperating in the guiding of the sheets along a transfer path and acted on by a pushing means

Title (de)

Blattzufuhrvorrichtung mit einem beweglichen Lastelement das zur Führung des Blattes längs einer Ubertragungsstrecke dient und das beeinflusst wird von einem Druckelement

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de feuilles comportant un moyen d'appui mobile coopérant au guidage des feuilles le long d'un chemin de transfert et sollicité par un moyen de poussée

Publication

EP 0725024 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96400214 A

Priority

FR 9501162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725024A1] The device transfers sheets from a pile (12) to a processing device, between a storage area upstream of an entry (270) to a path and a device (222, 223) for driving the sheet towards the exit (272) from the path having two branches forming an angle (271). A drive roller (201) makes contact with a sheet at the end of the pile in order to drive it. A friction device (203), opposite the roller, generates on the said sheet friction opposing its driving, in order to separate the sheet from the pile. A lower guide (220) guides the sheet from one branch to the other. A movable bearing means (233) in the plane of the said angle cooperates with the guiding of the sheet and a pushing means (250) exerts on the bearing means a predetermined force so that it opposes the resulting tension in the said sheet, at least when the latter is cooperating with the said drive device. Application: fax machines, etc <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/5238 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725024 A1 19960807; EP 0725024 B1 20000426; DE 69607873 D1 20000531; DE 69607873 T2 20001005; FR 2729938 A1 19960802

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69607873

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69607873

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607873

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-31

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990310

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970109

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB