Global patent index - EP 0725027 B1

EP 0725027 B1 2000-02-09 - Pallet for storing a sheet stack and automat for handling such pallet

Title (en)

Pallet for storing a sheet stack and automat for handling such pallet

Title (de)

Stapelbrett zur Ablage eines Bogenstapels und Handhabungsautomat für derartige Stapelbretter

Title (fr)

Palette de stockage d'une pile de feuilles et automate pour la manutention d'une telle palette

Publication

EP 0725027 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95810714 A

Priority

CH 365894 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725027A2] The stacking board is designed as a stackable pallet (1) which exhibits on its underside, on opposite side borders (1a, 1b), in each case two hollow feet (2) and two hollow latching protuberances (4,5) with a smaller engagement depth than that of the feet. The feet on each longitudinal border of the pallet are located opposite the hollow latching protuberances on the other longitudinal border. When a number of pallets are stacked upon one another, depending on the orientation of the pallets, either a tightly packed storage stack is produced where the feet of the top pallet are sunk into the hollow feet of the lower pallet, or a working, spaced apart stack is produced where the feet of one pallet engage into the hollow latching protuberances of the pallet below.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 31/30; B65D 19/26; B65D 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 33/02 (2006.01); B65D 19/00 (2006.01); B65D 21/04 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65G 57/00 (2006.01); B65H 7/00 (2006.01); B65H 31/00 (2006.01); B65H 31/02 (2006.01); B65H 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/0028 (2013.01); B65D 19/0002 (2013.01); B65D 19/0014 (2013.01); B65D 21/045 (2013.01); B65D 71/0096 (2013.01); B65H 31/30 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00268 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00288 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00318 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00338 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0094 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00055 (2013.01); B65H 2301/42256 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725027 A2 19960807; EP 0725027 A3 19970319; EP 0725027 B1 20000209; AT 189665 T 20000215; AU 3797195 A 19960613; AU 692940 B2 19980618; CA 2164183 A1 19960603; CA 2164183 C 20070327; CN 1062527 C 20010228; CN 1132173 A 19961002; DE 59507786 D1 20000316; JP 3679173 B2 20050803; JP H08239156 A 19960917; KR 100390581 B1 20030626; KR 100402840 B1 20040719; RU 2159732 C2 20001127; US 5664934 A 19970909; US 5738487 A 19980414

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141115

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141115

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141130

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141115

2015-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59507786

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20141223

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131116

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131115

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 189665

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20131115

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-06-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: HC

- Ref Document Number: 189665

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-02-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59507786

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2012-02-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59507786

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: REBLE & KLOSE RECHTS- UND PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-01-14 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KBA-NOTASYS SA

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-04-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507786

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-16

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189665

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1997-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970524

1997-10-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970825

1997-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE