Global Patent Index - EP 0725033 B1

EP 0725033 B1 2001-05-09 - Temporary securing of a working space

Title (en)

Temporary securing of a working space

Title (de)

Temporäre Arbeitsraumsicherung

Title (fr)

Sécurité temporaire d'espace de travail

Publication

EP 0725033 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101007 A

Priority

CH 25795 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725033A1] The hoist shaft (2) is accessible via a door (17). A set-down mechanism (28) has at least one swivelling buffer (8) which automatically moves from a pulled-back position into a securing position defining the access to the cabin (1). The buffer is preferably automatically tilted by gravity into the securing position, and retracted by an actuator (12) into the pulled-back position. The securing position is signalled by a safety switch (13) operated by the actuator which is de-activated when the shaft door is opened when the cabin is absent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/06 (2006.01); B66B 5/00 (2006.01); B66B 5/28 (2006.01); B66B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 5/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725033 A1 19960807; EP 0725033 B1 20010509; AT 201009 T 20010515; CA 2166841 A1 19960801; CA 2166841 C 20060822; DE 59606855 D1 20010613; DK 0725033 T3 20010806; ES 2158154 T3 20010901; FI 110771 B 20030331; FI 960410 A0 19960130; FI 960410 A 19960801; JP 4050342 B2 20080220; JP H08245110 A 19960924; NO 314722 B1 20030512; NO 960399 A 19960801; NO 960399 D0 19960130; US 5727657 A 19980317

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160126

2016-05-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160124

2016-03-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 201009 T

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-03-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2016-02-17 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160124

2016-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-02-01 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20160125

2016-01-27 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160124

2016-01-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606855

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150129

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-01-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158154 T3

2001-08-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-01 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010605

2001-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606855 20010613

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201009 T 20010515

2000-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000630

1997-03-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970118

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE