Global Patent Index - EP 0725126 B1

EP 0725126 B1 2000-08-09 - Process for desulfurizing catalytically cracked gasoline

Title (en)

Process for desulfurizing catalytically cracked gasoline

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Entschwefelung von Benzin von katalytischen Kracken

Title (fr)

Procédé de désulfuration d'essence craquée catalytiquement

Publication

EP 0725126 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96101595 A

Priority

JP 3776495 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725126A1] An efficient process for desulfurizing catalytically cracked gasoline, in which a reduction in olefin content is controlled to thereby minimize a reduction in octane number. A catalytically cracked gasoline is separated into a plurality of fractions including one or both of a fraction rich in sulfur compounds that are hard to desulfurize and a fraction rich in sulfur compounds that are easy to desulfurize. One or both of the fractions are subjected to hydrodesulfurization. The resulting fractions are then mixed with the remaining fractions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 45/02; C10G 65/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 3/14 (2006.01); C10G 45/02 (2006.01); C10G 45/04 (2006.01); C10G 45/08 (2006.01); C10G 65/16 (2006.01); C10G 67/04 (2006.01); C10G 69/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/16 (2013.01); C10G 45/02 (2013.01); C10G 67/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725126 A1 19960807; EP 0725126 B1 20000809; CA 2168720 A1 19960804; CA 2168720 C 20040622; DE 69609640 D1 20000914; DE 69609640 T2 20010412; JP 3443474 B2 20030902; JP H08209154 A 19960813; KR 100396143 B1 20031218; SG 52231 A1 19980928; TW 318862 B 19971101

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160204

2016-02-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160204

2016-02-05 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69609640

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150204

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609640

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-14

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-09-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIPPON MITSUBISHI OIL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-01-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981211

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961017

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT