Global Patent Index - EP 0725179 B1

EP 0725179 B1 2000-07-05 - Improvement in the unbalance preventing arrangement of the drum of a clothes washing machine

Title (en)

Improvement in the unbalance preventing arrangement of the drum of a clothes washing machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Vermeiden der Unwucht einer Waschmaschinentrommel

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour éviter le balourd du tambour d'une machine à laver

Publication

EP 0725179 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96100061 A

Priority

IT PN950006 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725179A1] Clothes washing machine comprising a washing tub and a perforated cylindrical drum adapted to rotate about its own axis, and provided with a dynamic unbalance preventing arrangement consisting essentially of a plurality of annular, ring-shaped hollow bodies (8) whose axes coincide with the axis of said drum, said hollow bodies having a sealed construction and being firmly attached to said cylindrical drum, and a plurality of movable balancing weights (11) that are arranged in a free slidable manner inside said hollow bodies which are grouped into two distinct assemblies (6,7), the hollow bodies of said two assemblies being provided to respectively adhere against the opposite bases (2,3) of said drum. Said hollow bodies are made by joining together two substantially symmetrical parts (9,10), each one of which is formed by a plurality of circular, coplanar, concentric, open grooves that are integrally connected to each other. The assemblies (6,7) are secured against their respective drum bases by means of a plurality of brackets (15) which are provided on the outer surface of the drum and are capable of mutually engaging respective zones of the outer edge of said assemblies. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 37/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 35/00 (2006.01); D06F 37/02 (2006.01); D06F 37/12 (2006.01); D06F 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 37/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725179 A1 19960807; EP 0725179 B1 20000705; CA 2168385 A1 19960802; DE 69609090 D1 20000810; DE 69609090 T2 20010315; ES 2150023 T3 20001116; IT 238832 Y1 20001115; IT PN950006 U1 19960801; IT PN950006 V0 19950201; JP H08252391 A 19961001

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040105

2005-01-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-08-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040104

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040104

2003-01-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030114

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150023 T3

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609090 20000810

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981023

2000-01-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981023

1998-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI S.P.A.

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970115

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE