Global patent index - EP 0725190 B1

EP 0725190 B1 2000-10-25 - Vertically perforated lightweight brick for the construction of masonry

Title (en)

Vertically perforated lightweight brick for the construction of masonry

Title (de)

Hochloch-Leichtziegel für den Mauerwerksbau

Title (fr)

Brique légère percée de trous perpendiculaires au plan de pose pour la construction d'un mur en maçonnerie

Publication

EP 0725190 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119784 A

Priority

DE 19502899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725190A1] The brick has surfaces on all sides which are parallel in pairs and are also vertical, with measurement tolerance being within defined range of 0.5 mm. Vertically running, positively fitting sections are provided on the load bearing surfaces of the brick. A vertically arranged groove (3) is provided on at least one of the load bearing surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19502899 A1 19960801; AT 197183 T 20001115; EP 0725190 A1 19960807; EP 0725190 B1 20001025

INPADOC legal status

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2002-12-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-10-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-11-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59508812

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-30

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-10-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197183

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980814

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970205

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT