Global Patent Index - EP 0725195 B1

EP 0725195 B1 2000-06-28 - Process for erecting concrete walls by means of braced shutterings

Title (en)

Process for erecting concrete walls by means of braced shutterings

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Errichten einer Betonwand unter Verwendung von verspannten Verschalungen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la construction de murs en béton avec emploi de coffrages tendus

Publication

EP 0725195 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105665 A

Priority

  • DE 4215731 A
  • EP 93912708 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2134473C] A process and device are disclosed for erecting concrete walls by means of braced shutterings. Shuttering planks (1, 2) are braced parallel to each other at a distance from each other that corresponds to the thickness of the concrete wall to be erected, by means of bracing anchors (3) having tubular spreaders (4). The bracing anchors (3) are removed from the erected concrete wall after the gap between the shuttering planks has been run in, and the shuttering planks (1, 2) are knocked off. The tubular spreaders (4) remaining in the concrete walls are filled with grouting material in order to seal the bracing spots. The grouting material is pressed into cavities and/or cracks located outside the casing of the tubular spreader (4) through holes (11) provided in the casing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 17/06; E04B 1/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 17/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/68 (2006.01); E04G 17/06 (2006.01); E04G 17/065 (2006.01); E04G 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/6816 (2013.01); E04G 17/06 (2013.01); E04G 17/0644 (2013.01); E04G 17/0652 (2013.01); E04G 23/0203 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9323640 A1 19931125; AT 146249 T 19961215; AT 194203 T 20000715; CA 2134473 A1 19931125; CA 2134473 C 19990126; CZ 282654 B6 19970813; CZ 9402741 A3 19950315; DE 4215731 A1 19931118; DE 59304752 D1 19970123; DE 59310069 D1 20000803; DK 0642620 T3 19961230; DK 0725195 T3 20000828; EP 0642620 A1 19950315; EP 0642620 B1 19961211; EP 0725195 A2 19960807; EP 0725195 A3 19961113; EP 0725195 B1 20000628; ES 2098040 T3 19970416; ES 2149400 T3 20001101; FI 104844 B 20000414; FI 945366 A0 19941114; FI 945366 A 19950109; GE P20012563 B 20010710; HU 219269 B 20010328; HU 9403080 D0 19941228; HU T71547 A 19951228; MD 1885 B2 20020331; MD 960322 A 19970731; NO 302583 B1 19980323; NO 311585 B1 20011210; NO 944279 A 19941110; NO 944279 D0 19941110; NO 975647 A 19941110; NO 975647 D0 19971204; PL 171625 B1 19970530; PL 172395 B1 19970930; RU 2102568 C1 19980120; RU 2126480 C1 19990220; RU 94045978 A 19961010; SK 136994 A3 19950412; SK 280036 B6 19990712; US 5914137 A 19990622; US 6159399 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070513

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-06-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070514

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070513

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070513

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070513

2008-01-21 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-01-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *RASCOR SPEZIALBAU G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060516

2006-07-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060728

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-07-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-05-16 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060516

2006-05-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060512

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050516

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2149400

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-09-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ORGANIZZAZIONE D'AGOSTINI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-08-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310069

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-06-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 642620

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194203

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-09-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROCESS FOR ERECTING CONCRETE WALLS BY MEANS OF BRACED SHUTTERINGS

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990420

1996-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960410

1996-08-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 642620

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE