Global Patent Index - EP 0725204 B1

EP 0725204 B1 2001-12-05 - Electric driving device for a belt of a roller shutter or the like

Title (en)

Electric driving device for a belt of a roller shutter or the like

Title (de)

Elektrische Antriebsvorrichtung für einen Gurt eines Rolladens od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande électrique pour une sangle d'un volet à rouleau ou des choses pareilles

Publication

EP 0725204 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95116408 A

Priority

DE 19503817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725204A2] The drive roller (10) for the belt (11) which pulls up the roller blind shutter is mounted in a box (12) in a recess in the wall. The motor housing (15) has a simple clip fastening onto the drive mechanism and drives the drive roller via a reduction gearing. An automatic clamping system (20 to 32) locks the drive mechanism when the motor unit is removed. The motor unit can be removed for access to the manual winding system. The clamp is held in the locked position by a spring (31), and grips the gear wheel attached to the drive roller. The motor housing also contains the control circuit and rechargeable batteries.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/70 (2006.01); E06B 9/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/70 (2013.01); E06B 9/78 (2013.01); E06B 2009/785 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725204 A2 19960807; EP 0725204 A3 19970122; EP 0725204 B1 20011205; AT 210241 T 20011215; DE 19503817 A1 19960814

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SOMFY FEINMECHANIK UND ELEKTROTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2006-11-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061106

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061018

2005-10-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050501

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041018

2005-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050501

2004-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041018

2003-10-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020220

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509911 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210241 T 20011215

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SOMFY FEINMECHANIK UND ELEKTROTECHNIK GMBH

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000214

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970722

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB LI NL