Global Patent Index - EP 0725250 B1

EP 0725250 B1 2003-06-04 - Improved control and safety device for gas appliances

Title (en)

Improved control and safety device for gas appliances

Title (de)

Steuer- und Sicherheitsvorrichtung für Gasgeräte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de réglage et de sécurité pour appareils à gaz.

Publication

EP 0725250 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96101396 A

Priority

IT TO950058 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725250A2] A control and safety device for burners of gas appliances is described, in particular for domestic use, capable of fulfilling a plurality of cooking functions, comprising all the known elements for their operation, including safety means which are actuated through an axial control given by a shaft of a cock controlling the burner operation. The main feature of the invention consists in that means (6, 9, 11) are provided for the safety activation, which give the axial control to said shaft through the rotation of the control knob of the cock also when said knob is not directly connected to said shaft, by converting at least a part of the rotary motion of the knob in an axial motion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/72 (2006.01); F23N 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/72 (2013.01); F23N 5/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725250 A2 19960807; EP 0725250 A3 19980304; EP 0725250 B1 20030604; DE 69628477 D1 20030710; DE 69628477 T2 20040513; ES 2200015 T3 20040301; IT 1279101 B1 19971204; IT TO950058 A1 19960801; IT TO950058 D0 19950201

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160526

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120201

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110224

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110307

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200015 T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628477 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000614

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980827

1998-03-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

1998-03-04 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23D 14/72

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB