Global Patent Index - EP 0725374 B1

EP 0725374 B1 2002-11-27 - Coin acceptor with device to test the hardness

Title (en)

Coin acceptor with device to test the hardness

Title (de)

Münzgerät mit einer Vorrichtung zur Härtebestimmung von Münzen

Title (fr)

Contrôleur de pièces de monnaie avec dispositif pour vérifier la dureté

Publication

EP 0725374 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95117912 A

Priority

DE 19503765 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19503765C1] A coin checking system tests on the basis of material hardness to detect if the coil is authentic. A piezo electric sensor 5 is mounted on a steel block at the end of a leaf spring supported as a cantilever 10. A contact element 4 is formed on the tip of the sensor and this is positioned to project through an aperture in a coin guide track. Coins are rolled along the inclined track and in doing so strike the contact element. The signal from the sensor is amplified and is in the form of a transient with the amplitude being indicative of the material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/06; G01N 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19503765 C1 19960502; EP 0725374 A2 19960807; EP 0725374 A3 19980520; EP 0725374 B1 20021127; ES 2184781 T3 20030416

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59510476

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130104

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111114

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111114

2012-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101115

2012-01-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120110

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070927

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-07-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031130

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184781 T3

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59510476 20030109

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07D 5/06 A, 7G 01N 3/52 B

1999-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991012

1998-11-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980924

1998-05-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB LI