Global Patent Index - EP 0725463 B1

EP 0725463 B1 2000-07-12 - A spark plug for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

A spark plug for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zündkerze für einen Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Bougie d'allumage pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0725463 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96300722 A

Priority

JP 1492095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725463A1] In a spark plug (1) for an internal combustion engine, an insulator (2) has a concentric axial bore (2a) in which a center electrode (3) is placed with a front end (3a) of the center electrode extending beyond a front end portion (2b) of the insulator. A metallic shell (4) is placed to support the insulator (2). An outer electrode (5) is connected to a front end (4a) of the metallic shell (4) to form a spark gap (G) with the front end portion (3a) of the center electrode (3). At least an outer surface of the outer electrode (5) is formed by a smoothly curved profile so as to smoothly run air-fuel mixture along the outer electrode (5). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 13/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/20 (2006.01); H01T 13/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/32 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725463 A1 19960807; EP 0725463 B1 20000712; CN 1050707 C 20000322; CN 1136721 A 19961127; DE 69609209 D1 20000817; DE 69609209 T2 20001123; JP H08213149 A 19960820

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69609209

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150210

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-02-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-01-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050126

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609209 20000817

2000-08-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROPRIA S.R.L.

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971210

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970203

1996-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT