Global patent index - EP 0725734 B1

EP 0725734 B1 2000-11-08 - IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PRINTING MACHINES

Title (en)

IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PRINTING MACHINES

Title (de)

VERBESSERUNGEN IN ODER IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT DRUCKMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

AMELIORATIONS DANS OU EN RAPPORT AVEC DES MACHINES A IMPRIMER

Publication

EP 0725734 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93909394 A

Priority

  • GB 9300864 W
  • GB 9209004 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2266269A] A method and apparatus are proposed for cleaning the ink chamber (27) of the ink rail (11) of a printing machine ink supply system and from which ink is delivered to an ink roller through a multiplicity of side-by-side stepped feed holes (29) in the rail (11), the method and apparatus utilising a plug (41) freely slidable within the chamber (27) and adapted to purge the chamber (27) of ink present in advance of the plug (41) on its movement longitudinally of the chamber. In analogous manner the plug (41) may be used to effect a colour change as between ink sources provided at opposite ends of the rail. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 31/02; B41F 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/20 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/08 (2006.01); B41F 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01); B41F 31/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2266269 A 19931027; GB 2266269 B 19950802; GB 9209004 D0 19920610; DE 69329658 D1 20001214; DE 69329658 T2 20010621; EP 0725734 A1 19960814; EP 0725734 B1 20001108; JP 3277329 B2 20020422; JP H08506280 A 19960709; WO 9407698 A1 19940414

INPADOC legal status

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080426

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080426

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070501

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070529

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-05-02 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-04-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MOINAS SAVOYE & CRONIN

2001-02-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010208

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329658

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-14

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

1999-11-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6B 41F 35/00 A, 6B 41F 31/02 B, 6B 41F 31/08 B

1999-11-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PRINTING MACHINES

1999-10-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6B 41F 35/00 A, 6B 41F 31/02 B, 6B 41F 31/08 B

1999-10-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: IMPROVEMENTS IN OR RELATING TO PRINTING MACHINES

1996-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19960812

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19941125

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE