Global Patent Index - EP 0725752 B1

EP 0725752 B1 2001-01-31 - AN APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING PARTICULATE MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH AN APPARATUS

Title (en)

AN APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING PARTICULATE MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH AN APPARATUS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN VON SCHÜTTGUT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER SOLCHEN VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL POUR LE TRANSPORT DE SUBSTANCES PARTICULAIRES ET PROCEDE POUR L'OPERATION D'UN TEL APPAREIL

Publication

EP 0725752 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94927280 A

Priority

  • US 9409776 W
  • US 11517393 A
  • US 11517793 A
  • US 11622993 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9506610A1] An improved apparatus (30) for transporting the metering particulate material (40) including a transport duct (36) having an inlet (32), an outlet (34), and at least one moving surface (31) located therebetween having a downstream facing drive surface. The apparatus further includes drive device for moving the moving surface (31) between the inlet (32) and the outlet (34) towards the outlet, and means for compacting the particulate material sufficiently to cause the formation of a bridge composed of substantially interlocking particulate material (40) spanning the width of the transport duct (36). The apparatus is used to transport and meter particulate material under ambient conditions and against pressure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 31/04; F04D 5/00; F04D 7/04; F04D 29/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 31/00 (2006.01); B65G 65/48 (2006.01); F04D 5/00 (2006.01); F04D 7/04 (2006.01); F04D 15/00 (2006.01); F04D 29/42 (2006.01); F04D 29/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 15/0083 (2013.01); F04D 5/001 (2013.01); F04D 7/04 (2013.01); F04D 29/4273 (2013.01); F04D 29/445 (2013.01); F05B 2230/90 (2013.01); F05C 2225/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9506610 A1 19950309; AT 199008 T 20010215; AU 687881 B2 19980305; AU 7677494 A 19950322; BR 9407456 A 19961112; CA 2170272 A1 19950309; CA 2170272 C 20050405; CN 1064922 C 20010425; CN 1129929 A 19960828; DE 69426653 D1 20010308; DE 69426653 T2 20010830; EP 0725752 A1 19960814; EP 0725752 A4 19980415; EP 0725752 B1 20010131; FI 109464 B 20020815; FI 960794 A0 19960221; FI 960794 A 19960329; HU 218761 B 20001128; HU T75450 A 19970528; JP 3659645 B2 20050615; JP H09502152 A 19970304; PL 174204 B1 19980630; PL 313263 A1 19960624; SG 43999 A1 19971114

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140830

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-10-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 199008 T

- Effective date: 20140831

2014-09-24 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20140830

2014-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-09-02 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69426653

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-12-13 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: PESTALOZZISTRASSE 2 POSTFACH 1416, 8201 SCHAFFHAUSEN (CH)

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130827

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130801

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130828

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-06-12 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-03-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Free text: BO 01/26 PAGES: 311, IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI

2002-01-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-07-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-06-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & SEIFERT

2001-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426653 20010308

2001-03-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19960308;SI PAYMENT 19960308

2001-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-31 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010131

2001-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199008 T 20010215

1999-10-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 65G 31/04 A, 6F 04D 5/00 B, 6F 04D 7/04 B, 6F 04D 29/42 B

1999-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AN APPARATUS FOR TRANSPORTING PARTICULATE MATERIAL AND A METHOD OF OPERATING SUCH AN APPARATUS

1998-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980713

1998-04-15 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19980225

1998-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960308

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960308;SI PAYMENT 960308

1996-08-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960308;SI PAYMENT 960308