Global Patent Index - EP 0725825 B1

EP 0725825 B1 2001-02-21 - PEPTIDES THAT ELICIT NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES AGAINST GENETICALLY DIVERGENT HIV-1 STRAINS

Title (en)

PEPTIDES THAT ELICIT NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES AGAINST GENETICALLY DIVERGENT HIV-1 STRAINS

Title (de)

PEPTIDE, DIE NEUTRALISIERENDE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN GENETISCH DIVERGIERENDE HIV-1 STÄMME, INDUZIEREN

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES QUI PRODUISENT DES ANTICORPS NEUTRALISANTS CONTRE DES SOUCHES DE VIH-1 GENETIQUEMENT DIVERGENTES

Publication

EP 0725825 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94927602 A

Priority

  • EP 94927602 A
  • EP 9403039 W
  • EP 93114631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9507354A1] Peptides are described which elicit antibodies, preferably including secretory antibodies secreted by mucosal surfaces, that show neutralizing activity against different strains and clinical isolates of HIV-1 and that inhibit the fusion of cells caused by HIV-1, which peptides are composed of a sequence of seven or eight amino acids corresponding to the ones on gp41 of gp160 of the HIV isolate BH10 at the position 662 to 668 (ELDKWAS) or at the position 661 to 668 (LELDKWAS) respectively, preferably including peptides being composed of the sequence ELDNWAS, ELNKWAS, LELDNWAS or LELNKWAS, or that are genetically encoded by nucleotide sequences corresponding to said amino acid sequences, or by sequences hybridizing to said nucleotide sequences, or by sequences deduced from said nucleotide sequences by degeneration. Preferably, the peptides substitute one or more parts of the amino acid sequence of a viral protein or are inserted into antigenic sites of a viral protein, e.g. by fusion of the respective nucleotide sequences, and subsequent expression of the fusion genes is carried out in a biological expression system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/48; A61K 39/21; A61K 39/395; C07K 14/16; C07K 16/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 38/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/21 (2006.01); A61K 39/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); C07K 4/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/06 (2006.01); C07K 14/16 (2006.01); C07K 16/10 (2006.01); C12N 7/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/48 (2006.01); C12N 15/86 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); A61K 31/14 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); C12R 1/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16122 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9507354 A1 19950316; AT 199260 T 20010315; AU 682893 B2 19971023; AU 7696594 A 19950327; BR 9407531 A 19970826; CA 2171544 A1 19950316; CA 2171544 C 20030624; CN 1135237 A 19961106; CZ 287808 B6 20010214; CZ 9600741 A3 19960717; DE 69426725 D1 20010329; DE 69426725 T2 20010906; EP 0725825 A1 19960814; EP 0725825 B1 20010221; ES 2156902 T3 20010801; HU 219507 B 20010428; HU 9600587 D0 19960528; HU T76102 A 19970630; JP H09502348 A 19970311; PT 725825 E 20010830; RU 2181379 C2 20020420

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040913

2005-09-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-05-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040912

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050314

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040913

2004-09-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040912

2003-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031002

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-09-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030910

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-08-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-07-10 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-02-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2156902 T3

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-05-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BUECHEL & PARTNER AG PATENTBUERO

2001-05-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2001-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426725 20010329

2001-03-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19960305;SI PAYMENT 19960305

2001-02-21 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

2001-02-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199260 T 20010315

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990917

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970305

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1996-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960305;SI PAYMENT 960305

1996-08-14 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 960305;SI PAYMENT 960305