Global Patent Index - EP 0725856 B1

EP 0725856 B1 2000-05-10 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CONCRETE SLEEPER BLOCKS FOR RAILROAD SWITCH-POINTS, AND A MATRIX AND MATRIX ARRAY FOR USE WHEN APPLYING THE METHOD

Title (en)

A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING CONCRETE SLEEPER BLOCKS FOR RAILROAD SWITCH-POINTS, AND A MATRIX AND MATRIX ARRAY FOR USE WHEN APPLYING THE METHOD

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BETONSCHWELLEN FÜR EISENBAHNWEICHENZUNGEN UND MATRIX UND MATRIXANORDNUNG BEI DER ANWENDUNG DIESER METHODE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE TRAVERSES ACCOLEES EN BETON POUR POINTS D'AIGUILLAGE DE CHEMIN DE FER, MATRICE ET ENSEMBLE DE MATRICES AFFERENTS

Publication

EP 0725856 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93913755 A

Priority

  • SE 9300534 W
  • SE 9201889 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9325756A1] In the manufacture of switch-point sleeper blocks of varying lengths and having a varying number of rail attachment devices provided in varying positions therealong, there is used a number of matrices (1) which are placed in a long form bed. The matrices (1) include holes in the region of promontories (10a) and the matrix dishes (3) are inserted in the holes and fastened to the matrices (1). When concrete is poured into the form bed and allowed to harden, concrete sleeper blocks which exhibit promontories (10a) of the said kind are obtained. The invention relates to a matrix provided with a matrix dish (3) and to a matrix array which includes a number of such matrices of varying lengths and with different positions for the matrix dishes (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01B 3/28; B28B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 23/00 (2006.01); E01B 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01B 7/22 (2013.01); B28B 7/0064 (2013.01); B28B 23/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9325756 A1 19931223; AT 192804 T 20000515; AU 4367593 A 19940104; AU 668961 B2 19960523; DE 69328632 D1 20000615; EP 0725856 A1 19960814; EP 0725856 B1 20000510; FI 945930 A0 19941216; FI 945930 A 19941216; FI 98396 B 19970228; FI 98396 C 19970610; NO 304319 B1 19981130; NO 944900 A 19941216; NO 944900 D0 19941216; SE 470359 B 19940131; SE 9201889 D0 19920618; SE 9201889 L 19931219

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120615

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070616

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ABETONG TEKNIK A.B.

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060616

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-06-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-06-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 29.09.2000 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2000-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-10-06 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-10-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-08-11 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69328632 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2000-05-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192804 T 20000515

1998-07-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980522

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19941130

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL