Global Patent Index - EP 0725874 B1

EP 0725874 B1 2001-02-28 - SYSTEM FOR SECURING PLATEFORMED ELEMENTS ON A SURFACE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR SECURING PLATEFORMED ELEMENTS ON A SURFACE

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM BEFESTIGEN VON PLATTENFÖRMIGEN ELEMENTEN AN EINER OBERFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DESTINE A FIXER DES ELEMENTS EN PLAQUE SUR UNE SURFACE

Publication

EP 0725874 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94901078 A

Priority

  • NO 9300172 W
  • NO 924498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9412743A1] A securing system is disclosed for the securing of slab elements such as slate plates or metal slabs to mainly plane surfaces, said securing system comprising a mainly horizontal (6) and optionally a mainly vertical (1) securing rail, where the cross section of the rails is mainly u-formed, and where to the horizontal securing rail there may be attached at least one brace (11) substantially designed with a u-shaped and with a backwards bent section at its ends to fit over the short leg (8) of the securing rail. The u-formed brace (11) carries the slab element (17) in the securing system. Further, the system comprises at least a mainly s-formed brace (14) which may be secured to the second leg (8) of the horizontal securing rail (6) as an upper support for the slab element (17). The system also preferably comprises a resilient element (19) which may also be secured to the second leg (8) of the securing rail (6), and which presses the slab element (17) against the securing braces (11, 14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; E04F 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0821 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9412743 A1 19940609; DE 69329979 D1 20010405; DE 69329979 T2 20010913; EP 0725874 A1 19960814; EP 0725874 B1 20010228; NO 924498 D0 19921123; SE 9501848 D0 19950518

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090601

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071119

2008-07-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070809

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-11-16 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061116

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-04-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NCC NORGE AS

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329979 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981022

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981022

1997-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RIEBER & SOEN ASA

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950522

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR IT NL SE