Global Patent Index - EP 0725915 B1

EP 0725915 B1 2001-01-10 - SELECTIVELY ACTUATABLE LIGHTER

Title (en)

SELECTIVELY ACTUATABLE LIGHTER

Title (de)

SELEKTIV BETÄTIGBARES FEUERZEUG

Title (fr)

BRIQUET A FONCTIONNEMENT SELECTIF

Publication

EP 0725915 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 93925011 A

Priority

  • US 9310158 W
  • US 96559692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9410503A1] A selectively actuatable lighter device (10) is disclosed which includes a body defining reservoir (12) for containing a combustible gaseous medium such as butane, and having a valve (20) arranged to be selectively actuated between a normally closed position and an open position which permits the exit of the gaseous medium. Such lighter (10) can selectively produce sparks at a location (19, 22) proximate to the gaseous medium exit to ignite the gaseous medium. Such lighter device (10) embodies a resiliently releasable valve actuator (14) which normally prevents actuation of the valve (22). The valve actuator (14) includes an interfering portion (14A) which is selectively movable to a position (Fig. 11) out of interference with an interfering portion (12A) of the lighter body, so that the gaseous medium may be released and ignited by the sparks. Once the valve actuator (14) is depressed and released, it returns to its closed or latched position to prevent actuation of the valve to the open position. To "re-use" the lighter, the valve actuator (14) must again be moved to an unlatched position so that the valve (22) can be actuated for subsequent ignition of the gaseous medium.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 2/28 (2006.01); F23Q 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 2/164 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9410503 A1 19940511; AT 198650 T 20010115; AU 5448694 A 19940524; AU 675992 B2 19970227; BR 9307301 A 19990601; CA 2147651 A1 19940511; CA 2147651 C 20020730; CN 1057375 C 20001011; CN 1091192 A 19940824; DE 69329865 D1 20010215; DE 69329865 T2 20010719; DK 0725915 T3 20010521; EP 0725915 A1 19960814; EP 0725915 A4 19950919; EP 0725915 B1 20010110; ES 2154274 T3 20010401; GR 3035546 T3 20010629; JP 3040820 B2 20000515; JP H08506412 A 19960709; MX 9306574 A 19940630; MY 115296 A 20030531; PT 725915 E 20010629; SG 50608 A1 19980720; TW 261657 B 19951101

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131023

2014-09-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140925

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131023

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-11-13 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20131021

2013-10-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69329865

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121026

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121025

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20121107

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111022

2012-05-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BIC CORPORATION, US

- Effective date: 20120420

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-07-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20100610 AND 20100616

2005-10-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051022

2004-10-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041004

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-06-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-04 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040504

2003-10-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031023

2003-08-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-06-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-06-10 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BIC CORP.

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2002-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-10-24 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20021024

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-10-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021022

2002-10-03 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20021003

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20011030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20011025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-22 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-10-22 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011022

2001-10-16 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20011016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011009

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20011004

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-10-04 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011004

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-06-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-04-12 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2001-04-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154274 T3

2001-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69329865 20010215

2001-02-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198650 T 20010115

1997-10-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970825

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19950428

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1995-09-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

1995-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE