Global Patent Index - EP 0726091 B1

EP 0726091 B1 2000-05-03 - Loop mixer

Title (en)

Loop mixer

Title (de)

Schlaufenmischer

Title (fr)

Mélangeur à circulation

Publication

EP 0726091 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101712 A

Priority

DE 19504272 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726091A1] Solids, partic. prods. contg. fibres, are mixed in a loop-type mixer having a cylindrical mixer housing (1), with inlet (2) and outlet (3) and contg. a cylindrical guide tube (4), from the inside of which prod. is deflected by a radial aperture (5) into an annular chamber (7). A rotating stripper tool (13) is positioned near the radial aperture, radially inwards of guide devices (10) and has a radial wall (15) with at least one wall section closed by a bevelled edge (18) so that the height of the wall varies. Pref. the wall section is triangular or saw-tooth shaped. Pref. the stripper is fastened to a drive shaft (8) of a feed screw (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 7/24; B01F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/24 (2006.01); B01F 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00208 (2013.01); B01F 7/243 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0726091 A1 19960814; EP 0726091 B1 20000503; DE 19504272 A1 19960822; DE 19504272 C2 19971023; ES 2150606 T3 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160208

2016-05-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160526

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160206

2016-03-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PE20

- Expiry date: 20160206

2016-02-10 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20160206

2016-02-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59605080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150216

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150224

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BILFINGER EMS GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59605080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20130606

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59605080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: GRAMM, LINS & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20130606

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010207

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2150606

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605080

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000503

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990917

1998-04-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DMT - GESELLSCHAFT FUER DOSIER- UND MISCHTECHNIK M

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970201

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL