Global Patent Index - EP 0726152 B1

EP 0726152 B1 2001-04-18 - Method of manufacturing an inkjet printhead

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing an inkjet printhead

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren für einen Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0726152 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250101 A

Priority

  • DE 4225799 A
  • EP 93250012 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0581395A2] An ink jet print head according to the edge shooter principle, wherein a part bearing chambers is fitted with means for supplying and discharging ink from a chamber assigned in each case to a nozzle. Arranged in each part bearing chambers is a group of chambers on the side facing a central part, and a single row of nozzles which has nozzle groups (1.1, 1.2, 1.3, 1.4, ...) belonging to k chamber groups (101, 102, 103, 104, ...) lies at the end edge of a first part bearing chambers. The first nozzle group (1.1) is connected to the chamber group (101) located in the same part, and the other k-1 nozzle groups (1.2, 1.3, 1.4, ...) are connected to the associated chamber groups (102, 103, 104, ...), the chamber groups being supplied with ink from a suction compartment (151, 152, 153, 154) and lying in other parts bearing chambers and arranged vertically offset. After a pretreatment of the plate material from which the print head is made, masking and etching of the plates take place in a parallel plate processing operation for all the individual parts. Separate finished individual parts are connected and contacted to form a module. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/16; B41J 2/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/1626 (2013.01); B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2/161 (2013.01); B41J 2/1623 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/1632 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14362 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14379 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14387 (2013.01); Y10T 29/42 (2013.01); Y10T 29/49401 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0581395 A2 19940202; EP 0581395 A3 19940824; EP 0581395 B1 19970319; CA 2101683 A1 19940201; CA 2101683 C 19981124; DE 4225799 A1 19940203; EP 0726152 A2 19960814; EP 0726152 A3 19961009; EP 0726152 B1 20010418; JP 2001293866 A 20011023; JP 3199917 B2 20010820; JP 3466577 B2 20031110; JP H06155739 A 19940603; US 5592203 A 19970107; US 5802687 A 19980908

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070112

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080112

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080112

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-09-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-02-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070202

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-07-06 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-11-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-06-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: DIGITAL GRAPHICS INCORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-07-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59310165

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2001-04-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 581395

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1997-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19970930

1996-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19961024

1996-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-08-14 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 581395

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI