Global patent index - EP 0726354 B1

EP 0726354 B1 2000-06-21 - Dryer group of a dryer section for web material and use of a dryer group to gradually reduce the vapor pressure in the interior of the web

Title (en)

Dryer group of a dryer section for web material and use of a dryer group to gradually reduce the vapor pressure in the interior of the web

Title (de)

Trockengruppe einer Trockenpartie für bahnförmiges Material und Verwendung einer Trockengruppe zum stufenweisen Reduzieren des Dampfdrucks im Materialbahninneren

Title (fr)

Groupe de séchage d'une section de séchage de matériaux en bande et utilisation d'un groupe de séchage pour réduire graduellement la pression de vapeur à l'intérieur de la bande

Publication

EP 0726354 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96100386 A

Priority

DE 19503767 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726354A1] The drying group of the drying section of a machine for a web material, and especially a papermaking machine, has a number of permeable drying blankets (9,11,13,15) at the drying cylinder (1), passing round it over each other, with at least two blankets at different positions on the peripheral surface of the drying cylinder (1). Pref. the drying blankets (9,11,13,15) have different permeabilities, decreasing from the lowest level at the drying cylinder (1), outwards. The angle (a-d) round the drying cylinder (1), covered by the drying blankets (9,11,13,15), decreases outwards from the lowest level. The strength of the innermost blanket (9) is less than the others (11,13,15), and it is finer and/or thinner than them. The drying blankets (9,11,13,15) are applied simultaneously or in succession to the web material. The system uses 2-4 blankets, in a drying group in a single row, with alternating drying cylinders and deflection rollers in separate rows, using drying suction rollers for the path deflection. The drying cylinders and the deflection rollers have about the same dia..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/08 (2006.01); D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/04 (2006.01); F26B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19503767 A1 19960808; AT 194021 T 20000715; CN 1042246 C 19990224; CN 1137084 A 19961204; EP 0726354 A1 19960814; EP 0726354 B1 20000621; FI 960479 A0 19960202; FI 960479 A 19960805; JP H08240383 A 19960917; US 5649371 A 19970722

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060112

2006-09-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-01-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060113

2006-01-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060112

2005-01-11 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-01-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050104

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010112

2000-11-17 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605454

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-27

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2000-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 194021

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-20 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DRYER GROUP OF A DRYER SECTION FOR WEB MATERIAL AND USE OF A DRYER GROUP TO GRADUALLY REDUCE THE VAPOR PRESSURE IN THE INTERIOR OF THE WEB

1999-01-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH SULZER PAPIERTECHNIK PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980727

1997-04-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970206

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE