Global Patent Index - EP 0726377 B1

EP 0726377 B1 2000-03-08 - Hinge

Title (en)

Hinge

Title (de)

Scharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière

Publication

EP 0726377 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95120479 A

Priority

AT 4395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726377A1] The hinge has an arm which is mountable on the wall of the furniture. The hinge arm is connectable to a hinge cup, fixed in a hole on the furniture door wing, via a rotary pivoting coupling. The hinge arm is connectable to a second hinge arm by a base plate or the hinge arm (21) provides a base plate for a further hinge arm (22). The hinge axis (40) of the hinge arms lie on a straight line. At least one of the hinge arms is held on the base plate by a spring loaded locking device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 3/04 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0726377 A1 19960814; EP 0726377 B1 20000308; AT 190379 T 20000315; AT 401187 B 19960725; AT A4395 A 19951115; DE 59507957 D1 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-02-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030226

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021213

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-08-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507957 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-03-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000308

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190379 T 20000315

1997-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970522

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961014

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE