Global Patent Index - EP 0726552 B1

EP 0726552 B1 2000-06-14 - Circuit for transmission of at least two information signals

Title (en)

Circuit for transmission of at least two information signals

Title (de)

Schaltungsanordnung zur Übermittlung von wenigstens zwei Meldesignalen

Title (fr)

Circuit pour la transmission d'au moins deux signaux d'information

Publication

EP 0726552 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96250027 A

Priority

DE 19505794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726552A1] The switching system has a signals from two possible sources (M1,M2) that are used to activate an output loudspeaker (SG). For example, one device can be triggered when the load limit of an electrical unit is exceeded, and the other when a temperature threshold is exceeded. The signals are applied to relays (R1,R2) connecting to a voltage source (U) and a relay (QR) is set to activate the output. Each signal is also coupled to an interrupt circuit (US). In the event that a second alarm signal occurs following generation from the other device then a transistor (T) is switched to reset the output relay followed by reactivation of the alarm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 25/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 25/018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19505794 C1 19960808; AT 193952 T 20000615; EP 0726552 A1 19960814; EP 0726552 B1 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2003-04-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030408

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-12-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021219

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-12-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605416 20000720

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-06-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193952 T 20000615

1999-10-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990831

1996-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960904

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI