Global patent index - EP 0726580 B1

EP 0726580 B1 2000-11-29 - Woven multiconductor

Title (en)

Woven multiconductor

Title (de)

Gewebter Leitungsverbund

Title (fr)

Multiconducteur tissé

Publication

EP 0726580 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101639 A

Priority

DE 19504600 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726580A1] A woven cable connector has several parallel flexible single wires on a woven base (1) and over the whole length, at least one supply or tap-off of one wire (2) is woven in. The combination is made from several woven sections which are then woven together. Instead of wires, photoelectric conductors, pneumatic lines or hydraulic lines could be used, or other signal-carrying media. At least one wire/conductor/line is a transverse one (3). A Jacquard weaving machine with controllable .... is used to make the combination.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/00 (2006.01); H01B 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0045 (2013.01); H01B 7/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0726580 A1 19960814; EP 0726580 B1 20001129; AT 197854 T 20001215; DE 19504600 A1 19960814; DE 19504600 C2 19961205

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090206

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *P-D-W KABELTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090228

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-08-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080109

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080129

- Year of fee payment: 13

2001-12-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO ZINK

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606159

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-04

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 197854

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: P-D-W KABELTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PSS UMWELTTECHNIK APPARATEBAU GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981030

1997-07-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PLANARWEAVE GMBH WEB- & KABEL TECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1997-07-16 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: PLANARWEAVE GMBH WEB- & KABEL TECHNIK

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP3

1997-04-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI

1997-03-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970111

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE LI