Global Patent Index - EP 0726587 B1

EP 0726587 B1 2000-06-14 - Rotary switch having two housing portions, each portion provided with a contact set

Title (en)

Rotary switch having two housing portions, each portion provided with a contact set

Title (de)

Drehschalter mit zwei jeweils eine Kontaktanordnung aufweisenden Gehäuseteilen

Title (fr)

Interrupteur rotatif ayant deux éléments de boîtier, chaque élément étant muni d'un jeu de contacts

Publication

EP 0726587 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96101450 A

Priority

DE 19503903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0726587A1] The rotary switch has a central spindle to which the manually operated knob is attached. Within the housing the spindle carries a profiled cam element (15) that operates the movable contacts. The movable contacts (10) are pressed metal elements profiled (24) to behave as leaf springs. A section is shaped (25) as a cam follower and the contact tip engages a pad on a fixed carrier (9). Movable contact carriers are positioned on both sides of the cam. Pins set into the base limit the angle of rotation. A spring loaded indent mechanism defines the contact switch points.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 19/00; H01H 19/62; H01H 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/62 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 25/06 (2013.01); H01H 19/62 (2013.01); H01H 2229/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19503903 A1 19960808; EP 0726587 A1 19960814; EP 0726587 B1 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090211

- Year of fee payment: 14

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605417 20000720

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990114

1999-03-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990114

1996-08-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960202

1996-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT